IL SB1056 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. In provisions amending the State Universities Retirement System Article of the Illinois Pension Code, removes language that changes references to the "optional defined contribution benefit" to "optional defined contribution plan". Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Deletes language providing that if in any case an error is made in billing a TRS benefit recipient under a provision concerning health benefits for TRS benefit recipients and TRS dependent beneficiaries, the Department shall identify the error and refund the overpaid amount as soon as practicable; and providing that a TRS benefit recipient who has overpaid shall be entitled to a refund of overpayments for up to 7 years of past payments. Provides that if, for any month beginning on or after January 1, 2013, a TRS benefit recipient or TRS dependent beneficiary was enrolled in Medicare Parts A and B and such Medicare coverage was primary to coverage under certain provisions of the Act but payment for that coverage was made at a rate greater than the Medicare primary rate published by the Department of Central Management Services, the TRS benefit recipient or TRS dependent beneficiary shall be eligible for a refund equal to the difference between the amount paid by the TRS benefit recipient or TRS dependent beneficiary and the published Medicare primary rate. Provides that to receive a refund, the TRS benefit recipient or TRS dependent beneficiary must provide documentation to the Department of Central Management Services evidencing the TRS benefit recipient's or TRS dependent beneficiary's Medicare coverage and the amount paid by the TRS benefit recipient or TRS dependent beneficiary during the applicable time period. Certain changes to the Illinois Pension Code and the changes to the State Mandates Act are effective immediately.
Title
PENSION-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0210 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022; Some Provisions Effective |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date July 30, 2021; Some Provisions Effective |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Pensions |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-027-001 |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 005-001-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martwick |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |