IL SB1058 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Indemnification Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Christine Radogno [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Sen. Darin LaHood [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 350 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |