IL SB1233 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0988
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0988
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Blue-Ribbon Commission on Transportation Infrastructure Funding and Policy Act. Creates the Blue-Ribbon Commission on Transportation Infrastructure Funding and Policy. Provides for the membership of the Commission. Provides for the appointment of a chairperson of the Commission by the Governor. Provides that the members shall be appointed by May 31, 2022. Provides for the meetings and duties of the Commission. Provides that the Commission shall report a summary of its activities and produce a final report of its data, findings, and recommendations to the General Assembly by January 31, 2023. Provides that the Act is repealed on February 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0988 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 19, 2021 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |