IL SB1291 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of ABATE special license plates for passenger vehicles of the first division, motor vehicles of the second division weighing not more than 8,000 pounds, and motorcycles. Provides that, in addition to the appropriate registration fees, an applicant for the special plates shall be charged a fee of $15 at original issuance and $2 at each renewal. Provides that the additional fees shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
VEH CD-SPECIAL PLATES-ABATE
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Bomke [R] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] | Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] |
Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
Rep. Joseph Lyons [D] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-05-17 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2011-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke |