IL SB1307 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the alternative retirement annuity provisions apply to a Tier 2 State highway maintenance worker. Authorizes a Tier 2 State highway maintenance worker to convert up to 8 years of certain service credit established before the effective date of the amendatory Act into eligible creditable service under the alternative retirement annuity provisions upon application and payment of a specified contribution. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase".
Title
PEN CD-SERS-ALTERNATE ANNUITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Pensions Special Issues |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1307&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1307.htm |