IL SB1325 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning appeals by the State.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0712 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-29 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-29 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-05-28 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-05-28 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-05-27 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-05-27 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-27 | First Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton | |
2009-05-27 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-05-27 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-05-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-05-15 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |