IL SB1325 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. With respect to the waiving of the prohibition against certain State officials and employees having State contracts, (i) requires that a granted waiver must be filed with the Secretary of State and Comptroller within 60 days after issuance or when contract performance begins, whichever is earlier, (ii) requires that the filing must occur before the contract is executed, and (iii) requires that the waiver must be published in the electronic Illinois Procurement Bulletin before the contract is executed. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT CONTRACT WAIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; - 3/10/2011 - Postponed |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 50-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1325&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1325.htm |