IL SB1325 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides a process for investigation into violations of the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the process starts with a complaint to be filed within 30 days of the alleged violation. Provides a $5,000 fine for knowingly filing a false complaint or a record or statement material to a false or fraudulent complaint. Provides a procedure for a response from a contractor or subcontractor. Provides a procedure for the Director of Labor in issuing a decision. Allows a party to request a hearing within 15 days of receiving notice of the Director's decision. Provides that a final order issued by the Director of Labor in relation to this investigation process is subject to judicial review under the Administrative Review Law. Effective immediately.
Title
PREVAILING WAGE - DUE PROCESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1325&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1325.htm |