IL SB1374 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, when assessing payment for any amount due for earnings increases in excess of 6%, the System shall exclude earnings increases as a result of a change in salary due to National Board Certification. Effective immediately.
Title
TRS-6% EXEMPTION-SALARY SCHED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-27 | To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Benefit Enhancements | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-02-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1374&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1374.htm |