IL SB1374 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Adds certain common interest community associations owned by limited liability companies to the list of associations subject to specified provisions of the Code. Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Makes associations organized as limited liability companies subject to the Act. Adds references to articles of organization. In places where the Act addresses an association's declaration or bylaws, adds operating agreements. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMON INT COMM'TY ASSOC-TERMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0041 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Effective Date July 14, 2015 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |