IL SB1382 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $8,200,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants under the Parents Too Soon Program and for grants and administrative expenses related to the Healthy Families Program, all for community-based home-visiting programs for parents of young, high-risk children. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$DHS GRANTS-HIGH RISK CHILDREN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-05 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-02-23 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-02-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1382&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB1382.pdf |