IL SB1420 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission may recall a decision or settlement when fraud has been determined to be committed related to the case. Provides that the Commission shall implement a rule to establish a process for recalling a decision or settlement that is subject to recall due to fraud. Provides that the fraud and insurance non-compliance unit of the Division of Insurance of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall employ one or more attorneys licensed to practice law in Illinois as special prosecutors who shall initiate and prosecute any necessary criminal or civil actions in any court or tribunal of competent jurisdiction in this State. Provides that the special prosecutors may also assist State's Attorneys in prosecuting violations of this Section, without charge to the county. Provides that when the Attorney General or a State's Attorney declines to prosecute a referral from the fraud and insurance non-compliance unit of an alleged violation of this Section, the Attorney General or the State's Attorney declining prosecution shall provide in writing a response to the unit within 30 days of such decision setting forth the reasons and basis for the decision. Provides that the unit shall provide the response to the employer.
Title
WORKERS COMP-FRAUD
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-03-26 | Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | To Executive Subcommittee on State And Local Government | |
2009-03-06 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-27 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1420&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1420.htm |