IL SB1420 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-29 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-29 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that the Rockland Fire Protection District shall be dissolved into the Libertyville Fire Protection District. Provides that, as soon as is practicable after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Libertyville Fire Protection District is to assume all powers, duties, assets, territory, levies, and property of the Rockland Fire Protection District.
Title
ROCKLAND FPD DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-10-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McConchie |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 28, 2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |