IL SB1448 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Crossing of Railroad Right-of-way Act. Applies only to crossings of a railroad right-of-way that is owned by a land management company and not a registered rail carrier. Provides that public utilities that locate their facilities within the railroad right-of-way for a crossing shall pay the land management company a one-time standard crossing fee of $1,500 for each crossing. Provides special circumstances under which the standard crossing fee is not imposed. Provides that, if the parties cannot agree that special circumstances exist, the dispute shall be submitted to non-binding arbitration. Provides procedures for the non-binding arbitration and provides that, if the parties cannot resolve their dispute based on the arbitrator's recommendation within 30 days, either party may, upon the expiration of the 30-day period, give written notice to the other party of the commencement of a binding arbitration proceeding. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-BUSINESS ENTERPRISES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0716 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Energy; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-21 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-21 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 21, 2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-05-05 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 | |
2009-03-06 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |