IL SB1589 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that unlawful use or possession of a weapon by a felon who is not confined to a penal institution or who is on parole or mandatory supervised release is an offense for which the person shall receive a mandatory sentence of imprisonment.
Title
CRIM CD-WEAPONS-FELON-IMPRISON
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Constance Howard [D] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0237 |
2011-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-004 |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Mu |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |