IL SB1592 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the monetary award program provisions of the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that if a recipient of a grant is not permitted to continue attending a higher education institution because he or she is not earning the minimum grades needed to continue to attend the institution, then that person may not attend another institution the following academic year if he or she wants to receive a renewal of the grant. Provides that after one academic year of non-attendance has passed, the person is entitled to renewal of the grant upon enrolling at another institution; makes related changes. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to request that the Illinois Association of Student Financial Aid Administrators make recommendations on possible changes to how the Commission determines the number of grants to be offered and to whom they are offered. Requires an institution to have a comprehensive advising program for students who are recipients of grants, and requires grant recipients to participate in an institution's advising program as a condition of receiving a grant; makes related changes. Requires institutions to provide specified information concerning grant recipients to the Commission, if requested, to demonstrate the value of the program and determine where improvements could be made; makes related changes.
Title
HIGHER ED-MONETARY AWARD PROG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5(a) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |