IL SB1617 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that no later than September 1, 2020, each alternative retail electric supplier and electric utility operating outside their service territory shall submit a required report to the Illinois Commerce Commission for the compliance period beginning January 1, 2019 and ending May 31, 2019. Removes language requiring alternative retail electric suppliers and electric utilities operating outside their service territories to make all alternative compliance payments that they were obligated to pay for periods through and including May 31, 2019, but were not paid as of that date. Removes language requiring alternative retail electric suppliers to certify in its annual reports that its retail customers are not paying the costs of alternative compliance payments or renewable energy resources that the alternative retail electric supplier is not required to remit or purchase. Effective immediately or on the date certain provisions of Public Act 99-906 take effect, whichever is later.
Title
UTILITY-RENEW PORTFOLIO STD
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (SE) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-115D | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1617&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1617.htm |