IL SB1707 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to establish and maintain a system for online voter registration no later than January 1, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-ONLINE REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1707&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1707.htm |