IL SB1707 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a change to a purpose for which the Water Pollution Control Loan Program shall be used. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-WATER REVOLVING FUND
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0187 |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Effective Date July 29, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 19.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |