IL SB1707 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program Act. Creates the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program within the Division of Mental Health of the Department of Human Services. Provides that the Program shall provide bridge rental subsidies for individuals at high risk of unnecessary institutionalization and individuals at high risk of overdose for purposes of stabilizing their mental illness or substance abuse disorder. Provides criteria for the award, computation, and payment of bridge rental subsidies. Sets forth the responsibilities of persons receiving bridge rental subsidies. Provides for the identification and referral to the Program of persons eligible to receive bridge rental subsidies prior to their discharge from a hospital or release from a correctional facility. Provides standards for housing service providers, long-term housing, and temporary rental units. Provides that the Department will contract with an independent outside research organization to evaluate the Program's effectiveness, and shall report the results of the evaluation to the General Assembly after 5 years. Provides rulemaking authority. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
HOUSING IS RECOVERY PILOT PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |