IL SB1717 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Prohibits the production, distribution, publishing, or broadcasting, with actual malice, of campaign material that contains a picture into which a candidate for public office or another person is superimposed. Prohibits, within 60 days of an election at which a candidate for elective office will appear on the ballot, the distribution, with actual malice, of materially deceptive audio or visual media of the candidate with the intent to injure the candidate's reputation or to deceive a voter into voting for or against the candidate. Provides remedies and exceptions for violating the provisions. Amends the Circuit Courts Act. Provides that proceedings in cases involving the registration or denial of registration of voters, the certification or denial of certification of candidates, the certification or denial of certification of ballot measures, and election contests shall be placed on the calendar in the order of their date of filing and shall be given precedence.
Title
ELEC CD-CAMPAIGN MATERIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 29D-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 29D-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 29D heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 35 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1717&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1717.htm |