IL SB1794 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board shall not issue a license to any licensed establishment unless, for each of 2 years prior to applying for a license, the licensed establishment generated no less than 80% of its revenue from the sale of food or beverages. In order to renew a license, the licensed establishment must have generated no less than 50% of its revenue from the sale of food or beverages for the year prior to applying for renewal. Provides that the Board Exclusion List and the Self-Exclusion List distributed to Illinois casinos be distributed to video gaming licensees and enforced by the licensees. Prohibits disclosure of the identity of anyone on the Self-Exclusion List. Prohibits various licensees from knowingly allowing any person on either list to play. Requires video gaming locations to separate video gaming terminals from the sight of any minor that may enter that location. Provides that video gaming areas must post signs on age restrictions. Provides that certain persons involved in the maintenance, operation, or supervision of video gaming terminals may not use or play video gaming terminals they are or may be responsible for. Provides that video gaming terminals shall only be operated during a location's regular business hours, when the video gaming terminals are generally available to the public for use or play. Makes other changes. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that counties may adopt a classification of liquor license that, when issued, authorizes the liquor license holder to subsequently apply to the Board for a license under the Video Gaming Act and to operate as a licensee if granted a license. Makes similar changes in the Illinois Municipal Code.
Title
GAMING-LICENSEE LIMITATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Gaming |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-03-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 40 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 40 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1126.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-10.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |