IL SB1816 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in all convictions for driving under the influence in which the person received any injury to his or her person or damage to his or her real or personal property as a result of the criminal act of the defendant, the court shall order restitution. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-RESTITUTION-DUI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-001 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Randall M. Hultgren | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |