IL SB1816 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Pharmacy Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Effective immediately.
Title
PHARMACY PRACTICE ACT-SUNSET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1816&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1816.htm |