IL SB1923 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that businesses that intend to establish a new wind power facility in Illinois may be considered "high impact businesses" and qualify for certain occupation tax exemptions. Exempts businesses that intend to establish new wind power facilities from provisions of the Act requiring applicants for designation as high impact businesses to provide the Department with (i) the prospective plan for which 1,500 full-time jobs would be eliminated if the business is not designated and (ii) proof of alternative non-Illinois sites which would receive the proposed investment and job creation if the business is not designated, and from provisions of the Act concerning revocation of high impact business status. Requires payment of prevailing hourly wages.
Title
ENTERPRISE ZONE ACT-WIND FARMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0028 | |
2009-06-30 | Effective Date July 1, 2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2009-05-18 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-018-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-04-30 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-04-30 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-30 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-04-06 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Garrett | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Energy; 014-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-09 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Energy | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |