IL SB1923 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois regarding the Department of Transportation's target market program. Makes various changes concerning: the duties of the Department and the chief procurement officer; reviewing evidence of discrimination; establishment and implementation of a target market program tailored to address findings of discrimination; reports to the General Assembly; determination of contract formation and bidding procedures for target market contracts; requirements relating to participation in the target market program; inclusion of contracts funded by the federal government; deletion and designation of contracts for purposes of the target market program; payments under target market contracts; nomenclature; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-REDUCE DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0228 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date July 28, 2011 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-006-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 006-003-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 8, 2011 |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |