IL SB2165 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public Trust in Funding Responsibility Act. Prohibits a State agency from contracting with or making a grant to an entity that performs abortions or maintains or operates a facility where abortions are performed that involves the expenditure of State funds. Defines "State funds" as funds obtained through State taxation, fees, or assessments and provides that "State funds" does not include funds obtained from the federal government, federal funds administered or granted through a State agency, or State funds the expenditure of which is required by federal law. Exempts from the prohibition funding to hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers licensed under State law. Provides that the Act only applies to contracts and grants entered into, and the renewal of contracts entered into, on or after the effective date of this Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FUNDING RESPONSIBILITY ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-08-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2165&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2165.htm |