IL SB2236 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that within 90 days after filing an appearance (instead of prior to filing any other pleading other than a motion for an extension of time within which to plead), a party may object to the court exercising personal jurisdiction over the party. Provides that participating in the litigation does not waive the jurisdictional argument (and deletes a provision that if a party files a responsive pleading other than a motion for an extension of time prior to filing a motion to dismiss or to quash service of process, the party waives all objections to the court's jurisdiction over the party's person). Deletes a provision that states that error in ruling against an objecting party is waived by that party taking part in further proceedings in the case unless the objection is on the basis of the party not being amenable to service by an Illinois court. The changes made apply to actions filed after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-PERSONAL JURISDICTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2236&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2236.htm |