IL SB2236 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various acts to remove provisions allowing or requiring licensing authorities to revoke professional licenses for defaulting on an educational loan provided by or guaranteed by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Effective immediately.
Title
PROF REG-STUDENT LOAN DEFAULT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-18 | House | Remains in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-05-18 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 004-005-001 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-002-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |