IL SB2237 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Board of Education Article of the School Code. Provides that, Subject to appropriation, the State Board of Education shall distribute grants to early childhood education and care nonprofit organizations that are established as a Section 501(c)(3) organization and that are dedicated to providing early childhood education and care services to children and families to provide transportation services to families that have trouble affording transportation to early childhood education and care centers. Creates the Early Childhood Education and Care Transportation Fund. Provides that the State Board of Education shall develop an application process for this grant program. Provides that grant funds be distributed annually. Provides that the application process shall require that early childhood education and care nonprofit organizations detail how many families and children would receive transportation assistance from the program, the amount of funding needed per child in their area to fund adequate transportation for the year, and how the funding will be used to provide transportation for each family in the application. Provides that the State Board of Education shall require that any early childhood education and care nonprofit organizations that receive funding shall report the amount of money used for transportation during the State's previous fiscal year and return unused funds to the Early Childhood Education and Care Transportation Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change.
Title
SCH CD-EARLY CHILD TRANSPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.196 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2237&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2237.htm |