IL SB2240 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an insurer may not refuse to issue vehicle insurance to a person solely because the applicant is a volunteer driver and may not impose a surcharge or otherwise increase the rate for a vehicle policy solely on the basis that the named insured or any member of the insured's household or a person who customarily operates the insured's vehicle is a volunteer driver. Provides that the provision concerning volunteer driver protection shall not prohibit an insurer from taking any actions upon factors other than the volunteer status of the insured driver. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-VOLUNTEER DRIVERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |