IL SB2240 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Government Severance Pay Act. Modifies the definition of "severance pay" to apply to a university president or chancellor who is transitioning to a new position within the university for which he or she is employed, but excluding interim presidents and interim chancellors. Provides that a contract containing a severance pay provision must include, among other requirements, a requirement that if a provision to transition into a different position is included in a university president's or chancellor's contract, then the contract must include specified provisions. Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Requires, beginning July 1, 2022, the Board of Higher Education to create and maintain on its Internet website an online trustee resource center that shall include specified information. Defines "Department". Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT SEVERANCE PAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0378 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date August 13, 2021 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 415 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 415 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |