IL SB2245 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pesticide Act. Provides that, no later than January 1, 2022, the Department of Agriculture shall develop a drift monitoring study to evaluate pesticide drift at 3 schools within the State and shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly no later than January 1, 2023. Repeals the provisions regarding the drift monitoring study on January 1, 2024. Provides that it is unlawful to apply a restricted use pesticide on or within 500 feet of a school property during normal hours, except for whole structure fumigation, unless the pesticide application information listed on the pesticide label is more restrictive, in which case the more restrictive provision shall apply. Directs the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement the restriction. Defines "normal school hours". Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
PESTICIDES-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0548 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 109-003-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 60 | 13.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 60 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |