IL SB2280 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides restrictions on the retail sale of cats, dogs, and rabbits by pet shop operators in Will County and DuPage County. Provides that pet shop operators may offer a dog, cat, or rabbit for sale only if the pet shop operator has obtained the dog, cat, or rabbit from an animal control facility, animal shelter, animal care facility, kennel, pound, or training facility operated by a subdivision of local, State, or federal government or a specified animal rescue organization. Provides that a pet shop operator shall not offer for sale a dog, cat, or rabbit that is younger than 8 weeks old. Provides that a pet shop operator shall maintain specified records of each dog, cat, or rabbit sold. Provides for civil penalties for each violation of the provisions. Provides that the provisions do not prohibit the county or a municipality in Will County or DuPage County from adopting requirements that are more protective of animal welfare than those set forth in the provisions. Provides that the home rule units in Will County or DuPage County may adopt an ordinance explicitly exempting itself from the provisions and requires a copy of the ordinance to be filed with the Index Department of the Secretary of State's Office. Limits the concurrent exercise of power by home rule units.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE-PET SHOPS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2280&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2280.htm |