IL SB2280 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. In a provision concerning abandonment of service, provides for the procedure through which a Small Electing Provider may choose to cease offering or providing a telecommunications service. Defines "Small Electing Provider" as an incumbent local exchange carrier that is an electing provider, and that, together with all of its incumbent local exchange carrier affiliates offering telecommunications services within the State of Illinois, has fewer than 40,000 subscriber access lines as of January 1, 2020. Extends the repeal dates of the Telecommunications Article and the Cable and Video Competition Article from December 31, 2021 to December 31, 2026. Provides that any cable service or video service authorization issued by the Illinois Commerce Commission will expire on December 31, 2029 (rather than December 31, 2024). Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES REPEAL EXTENSION
Sponsors
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Future Cellular Development |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-1200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 13-406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 21-1601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 21-401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2280&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2280.htm |