IL SB2727 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EPA-COSMETIC PRODUCT-MICROBEAD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0638 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2014-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-13 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment; 007-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Environment |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |