IL SB2727 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Governmental and Governmental Employees Tort Immunity Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
745 | 10 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2727&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2727.htm |