IL SB2956 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Barriers Act. Changes references from "accessibility standards" to "the Illinois Accessibility Code", and makes related changes. Makes changes to provisions concerning definitions. Removes a provision requiring the Capital Development Board to establish standards for areas restricted to employee use. Requires the Capital Development Board to update the Code within 3 years (rather than 2 years) after federal standards are updated. Provides that the Act generally applies to public facilities and multi-story housing constructed after May 1, 1988, with specific provisions concerning the Code's application. Requires new housing construction to comply with the Department of Housing and Urban Development's March 6, 1991 Fair Housing Accessibility Guidelines and all later versions, amendments, and supplements. Requires all alterations to public facilities and multi-story housing to comply with the Code as it exists at the time of alteration. Adds provisions concerning alterations that impact accessibility or usability of paths of travel. Repeals provisions concerning alterations. Combines provisions concerning civil enforcement and other penalties. Provides that any violation of the Code is a violation of the Act. Provides the Attorney General with discretion to investigate complaints made under the Act. Adds enforcement provisions concerning the powers of the Attorney General. Changes references from "environmentally limited persons" to "individuals with disabilities". Makes other changes.
Title
ENVIRONMENTAL BARRIERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0582 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-006-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 25 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |