IL SB2963 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Hazardous Materials Transportation Act. Defines "Local road" as any State roadway, except for (i) a highway with 4 or more lanes, or (ii) an interstate highway. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL ROAD; POLICE VEHICLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |