IL SB2978 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes changes with respect to the exemptions from disclosure for personal information of public employees and officials, for the investigation, settlement, and adjudication of public employee grievances or disciplinary cases, and for administrative enforcement and law enforcement records. Permits (now, requires) a court to award reasonable attorney fees and court costs to a person who prevails in a proceeding to enforce disclosure of records. Effective January 1, 2011.
Title
FOIA-EXEMPTIONS/FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-24 | To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2978&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2978.htm |