IL SB3037 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1290
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law, the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, and the State Finance Act. Changes the name of the "Ticket For The Cure Fund" to the "Carolyn Adams Ticket For The Cure Grant Fund". Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-TICKET FOR THE CURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-26 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1290 | |
2010-07-26 | Effective Date July 26, 2010 | |
2010-07-26 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-002-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-001-000 | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |