IL SB3076 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Authorizes the board of commissioners in a county having a population of more than 500,000 people to establish police powers within its Office or Department of Homeland Security and Emergency Management and to define and prescribe certain employees hired in that Office or Department with peace officers' duties and compensation. Establishes certain training and other requirements that a person must fulfill before he or she is appointed with police powers. Provides that a person with police powers shall have the power to investigate and mitigate threats of manmade disasters, protect the county's critical infrastructure, have access to law enforcement databases, protect the county's emergency assets and personnel that get deployed upon the request of local law enforcement agencies in emergency circumstances, protect county elected officials as requested, and observe and enforce local, county, and State ordinances and laws.
Title
IEMA-POLICE POWERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |