IL SB3156 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Livestock Management Facilities Act. Provides that livestock waste may continue to be applied to the soil if the average Bray P1 or Mehlich test result for soil phosphorus is 70 pounds (rather than 300 pounds) or less of elemental phosphorus per acre. Provides further that if the test result for soil phosphorus for an application field is greater than 70 pounds (rather than 300 pounds) of elemental phosphorus per acre, the owner or operator shall apply livestock waste until the test results indicate that there is less than 70 pounds (rather than 300 pounds) of elemental phosphorus per acre. States that the Illinois Department of Agriculture may reduce the application field to less than 70 pounds (rather than 300 pounds) of elemental phosphorus per acre in any county if the Department determines that this change is necessary to protect local waterways. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMALS-WASTE-SOIL PHOSPHORUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (AG) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 77 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3156&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3156.htm |