IL SB3277 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Directs the Department of Public Health, in conjunction with others, to develop mandatory protocols and best practices for providing the necessary medical guidance for Duchenne muscular dystrophy. Provides that the protocols and best practices developed by the Department shall: (i) be published on a designated and publicly accessible Internet website; (ii) include up-to-date information about Duchenne muscular dystrophy; (iii) reference peer-reviewed scientific research articles; (iv) incorporate guidance and recommendations from the National Institutes of Health and any other persons or entities determined by the Department to have particular expertise in Duchenne muscular dystrophy; and (v) be distributed to physicians, other health care professionals and providers, and persons subject to Duchenne muscular dystrophy. Provides that the Department shall prepare a report of all efforts undertaken by the Department under the provisions. Provides that the report under the provisions shall be posted on the Department's Internet website and distributed to local health departments and to any other facilities as determined by the Department.
Title
MUSCULAR DYSTROPHY AWARENESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0964 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett |