IL SB3350 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a candidate political committee may not accept contributions during an election cycle from the candidate or the candidate's spouse, parent, or child with a total aggregate value of more than (i) $250,000 for a statewide office candidate or (ii) $100,000 for a candidate for any other office. Removes provisions eliminating campaign contribution limits for all candidates for an office when one of the candidates accepts contributions from the candidate or the candidate's spouse, parent, or child with an aggregate total value of more than (i) $250,000 for a statewide office candidate or (ii) $100,000 for a candidate for any other office. Effective January 1, 2011.
Title
CAMPAIGN CONTRIBUTION LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-17 | To Executive Subcommittee on Campaign Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rickey R. Hendon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3350&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3350.htm |