IL SB3374 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to by rule implement a methodology to reimburse hospitals for inpatient stays extended beyond medical necessity due to the inability of the Department, the managed care organization (MCO) in which a medical assistance recipient is enrolled in, or the hospital discharge planner to find an appropriate placement after discharge from the hospital to the next level of care. Requires the Department to by rule implement a methodology effective for dates of service January 1, 2025 and later to reimburse hospitals for emergency department stays extended beyond medical necessity due to the inability of the Department, the MCO, or the hospital discharge planner to find an appropriate placement after discharge from the hospital setting to the next appropriate level of care. Provides that both methodologies shall provide reasonable compensation for the services provided attributable to the hours of the extended stay for which the prevailing rate methodology provides no reimbursement. Contains provisions concerning the rate for inpatient days of care; hourly rates of reimbursement for emergency department stays; a prohibition on MCOs restricting coverage due to delays caused by the Department or the MCOs in completing the pre-admission screening and resident review process; a prohibition on MCOs imposing authorization or documentation requirements and other conditions of reimbursement that are more restrictive than standards under the fee-for-service medical assistance program; sanctions on MCOs for noncompliance; and administrative rules. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-EXTENDED HOSP STAYS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 14-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3374&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3374.htm |