IL SB3409 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the driver of a vehicle involved in a motor vehicle accident resulting only in damage to a vehicle may move the vehicle as soon as possible off the highway to the nearest safe location on an exit ramp shoulder, a frontage road, the nearest suitable cross street, or other suitable location that does not obstruct traffic and remain at that location until the driver has fulfilled the requirements of the Section of the Code concerning the duty to give information and render aid.
Title
VEH CD-HWY:NO-INJURY ACCIDENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0763 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |