IL SB3432 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sports Wagering Act. Provides that sports wagering may not be offered in the State until the Illinois Gaming Board determines that federal statutes prohibiting sports wagering have been repealed or the United States Supreme Court finds those federal statutes unconstitutional. Authorizes sports wagering at a gaming facility that is authorized to conduct gambling operations under the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that a sports wagering operator may offer sports wagering in-person at the licensed facility and over the Internet through an interactive sports wagering platform. Provides for licensure of interactive sports wagering platforms. Requires a sports wagering operator to verify that a person placing a wager is of the legal minimum age. Requires a sports wagering operator to allow an individual to restrict himself or herself from placing wagers with the operator. Requires the Board to adopt rules concerning standards for a sports wagering operator's advertisements for sports wagering. Provides integrity requirements for a sports wagering operator. Requires a sports wagering operator to maintain all records of bets and wagers placed. Requires a sports wagering operator to submit a report to the Board annually with the number of accounts established, winnings awarded, gross wagering revenue received, and other information. Requires a sports wagering operator to pay a 12.5% tax of its gross sports wagering revenue. Provides civil penalties for a person or entity that knowingly violates provisions under the Act. Provides that all moneys collected under the Act shall be deposited into the State Gaming Fund. Makes conforming changes in the Riverboat Gambling Act and the Criminal Code of 2012.
Title
SPORTS WAGERING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Gaming |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gaming |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 28-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3432&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3432.htm |