IL SB3498 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act. Creates a second set of incentive periods beginning on July 1, 2020 and ending on June 30, 2026. Provides that the credit shall not exceed $5,000 per employee hired. Provides that the maximum amount of credits allowed is $75,000,000. Effective immediately.
Title
SMALL BUSINESS-INCENTIVE
Sponsors
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-03-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 25 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3498&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3498.htm |