IL SB3521 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2013, the Secretary of State is authorized to collect for deposit into the Motor Vehicle License Plate Fund a delinquent vehicle dealer transfer fee in the following amounts: $20 if the certificate of title is received 30 days after the date of sale; $35 if received after 60 days; $65 if received after 90 days; $100 if received after 120 days. Provides that prior to issuance of a certificate of title, a homemade trailer must be inspected by a Secretary of State employee (instead of by a Secretary of State investigator). Provides that the Secretary may issue a dealer lien release certificate of title for a fee of $20, provided certain conditions are met. Provides that the Secretary may deny, revoke, or suspend the dealer license of a licensee who has failed to pay, within 90 days after notice has been given, any fine or fee owed as a result of an administrative citation issued by the Secretary. Increases the fine for operating a business after having failed to obtain a license from $300 to $500 per day. Increases the fine for operating a business with a revoked, suspended, denied, or cancelled license from $500 to $1000 per day. Provides that instead of filing a criminal complaint against an entity licensed by the Secretary, a Secretary of State Police investigator may issue administrative citations for violations of statutes or rules concerning dealers, transporters, wreckers and rebuilders. Contains procedural requirements concerning the issuance of administrative citations. Provides that the penalty imposed by issuance of an administrative citation shall not exceed $50 per violation. Provides that penalties paid as a result of the issuance of administrative citations shall be deposited in the Secretary of State Police Services Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-SOS:DEALERS;ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed November 28, 2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed March 29, 2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-003-000 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 2-119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-803 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3521&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3521.htm |